EP2952501 - ANTI-CANCER DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANE DERIVATIVES AND A CATALYTIC METHOD FOR DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANE SYNTHESIS AND ALLOCOLCHICINOID SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Windsor 401 Sunset Avenue Windsor, Ontario N9B 3P4 / CA | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, James 3345 Maisonneuve Avenue Windsor, Ontario N9E 1Y6 / CA | 02 /
MEHDI, Mariam 1227 Central Avenue Windsor, Ontario N8Y 3V1 / CA | 03 /
DJURDJEVIC, Sinisa 2870 Askin Avenue Windsor, Ontario N9E 3H9 / CA | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 15170291.7 | 02.06.2015 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | US201462007106P | 03.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462007106 P | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2952501 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2952501 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/76, C07C43/295, C07C231/10, C07C233/23, C07C247/14, C07C49/255, C07C43/23, C07D317/70, C07D317/54 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C07C233/52 (EP,US);
C07C49/255 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C213/02 (US);
C07C227/04 (US);
C07C231/12 (US);
C07C233/23 (EP,US);
C07C247/14 (US);
C07C41/18 (US);
C07C41/30 (US);
C07C43/23 (US);
C07C43/295 (US);
C07C45/65 (US);
C07C49/755 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07C67/313 (US);
C07C67/333 (US);
C07C67/343 (US);
C07C69/94 (EP,US);
C07D317/54 (EP,US);
C07D317/70 (EP,US);
C07C2603/32 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTAN-DERIVATE GEGEN KREBS UND KATALYTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANSYNTHESE UND ALLOCOLCHICINOIDSYNTHESE | [2015/51] | English: | ANTI-CANCER DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANE DERIVATIVES AND A CATALYTIC METHOD FOR DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANE SYNTHESIS AND ALLOCOLCHICINOID SYNTHESIS | [2015/51] | French: | DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANES COMME MEDICAMENT CONTRE CANCER ET PROCÉDÉ CATALYTIQUE DE SYNTHÈSE DE DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANE ET DE SYNTHÈSE D'ALLOCOLCHICINOIDE | [2015/52] |
Former [2015/51] | DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANES COMME MÉDICAMENT CONTRE LE CANCER ET PROCÉDÉ CATALYTIQUE DE SYNTHÈSE DE DIBENZOCYCLOHEPTANE ET DE SYNTHÈSE D'ALLOCOLCHICINOIDE | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 25.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - KRISTEN LAROCQUE ET AL, "Novel Analogue of Colchicine Induces Selective Pro-Death Autophagy and Necrosis in Human Cancer Cells", PLOS ONE, (20140123), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0087064, page e87064, XP055207089 [X] 1-5,7 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 3; figure 1 * * abstract * [I] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0087064 | [XDA] - SINISA DJURDJEVIC ET AL, "Intramolecular Nicholas Reactions in the Synthesis of Dibenzocycloheptanes. Synthesis of Allocolchicine NSC 51046 and Analogues and the Formal Synthesis of (-)-Allocolchicine", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20101203), vol. 75, no. 23, doi:10.1021/jo101953n, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8241 - 8251, XP055207032 [XD] 1-5 * page 8245; compounds 18e, 19e, 20e, 21 * * page 8250, column 2, paragraph l * * page 8241, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 8244; table 2 * * page 8245; table 3 * * scheme 5; page 8245 * [A] 8-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo101953n | [A] - AMIT JANA ET AL, "Lateral Lithiation-Initiated Annulations in the Synthesis of 1-Oxygenated Carbazole Alkaloids and a Cycloheptacarbazole", SYNLETT, DE, (20120621), vol. 23, no. 12, doi:10.1055/s-0031-1290380, ISSN 0936-5214, pages 1769 - 1774, XP055228639 [A] 8-15 * scheme 9, compounds 40, 42, 43; page 1772 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0031-1290380 | by applicant | - DJURDJEVIC, S.; YANG, F.; GREEN, J. R., J ORG. CHEM., (2010), vol. 75, page 8241 | - DJURDJEVIC, S.; GREEN, J. R., ORG. LETT., (2007), vol. 9, page 5505 |