EP2960147 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwards, Huw L c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Ong, Max C Y c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 03 /
Thompson, Haydn A c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15170707.2 | 04.06.2015 | [2016/01] | Priority number, date | GB20140011341 | 26.06.2014 Original published format: GB 201411341 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2960147 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2960147 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B63H5/125, G01B5/00, H04B7/02, H04B7/06, H04B7/12, H04J11/00, H04L1/04 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04B7/02 (EP);
H04B1/1081 (US);
G01M15/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/04 (EP,US);
B63H2005/1256 (EP,US);
B63H5/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2016/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2016/01] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2016/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2015 | AL | 16.10.2019 | AT | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | CZ | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | ES | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | IT | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | NL | 16.10.2019 | PL | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SE | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | IE | 04.06.2020 | LU | 04.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.06.2015 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 16.10.2019 | |
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 16.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1971096 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0053] - [055 ] - [0076] , [0111] *; | [A]WO2012035948 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2013233368 (DOWBEN PETER [US]) [X] 14,15 * paragraph [0021] *[A] 8-10; | [Y]EP2720313 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * |