EP3101603 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION GATEWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Easy Payment Gateway Ltd Euro Suites 4.3.01 & 02 Eurotowers GX11 1AA Gibraltar / GI | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPURRO, Alexzandre Anthony 29 Willow Lodge, Montagu Gardens Gibraltar, GX111AA / GI | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones IP Limited Southgate House Southgate Street Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL1 1UB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Wynne-Jones, Laine and James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15170716.3 | 04.06.2015 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101603 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q30/06 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q20/202 (CN);
G06Q20/027 (US);
G06Q10/06316 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q20/00 (RU);
G06Q20/367 (CN);
G06Q20/4014 (CN,US);
G06Q30/0613 (EP,US);
G07G1/14 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN TRANSAKTIONSGATEWAYS | [2016/49] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION GATEWAY | [2016/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE PASSERELLE DE TRANSACTION ELECTRONIQUE | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 07.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18] | 12.12.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012209630 (IHM NICHOLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]WO2015044162 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, line 2 - page 13, line 26 *; | [I]WO2015051074 (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 24 - page 19, line 7 * |