EP2977092 - PRODUCT GAS CONCENTRATOR AND METHOD ASSOCIATED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invacare Corporation One Invacare Way Elyria, OH 44035-4190 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states Invacare Corp. One Invacare Way Elyria, Ohio 44036-2125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRINKLE, Thomas B 30751 Beachwood Drive Rocky River, OH 44116 / US | 02 /
DANIELS, William J. 7265 Northview Drive Wadswoth, OH 44281 / US | 03 /
DROBNAK, Thomas A. 26951 Arbor Lane Olmsted Township, OH 44138 / US | 04 /
FELTY, David G. 5921 Sandy Hook Drive Parma, OH 44134 / US | 05 /
HODOS, Valentine A 13904 Highlandview Ave. Cleveland, OH 44135 / US | 06 /
Fabian, Martin J. 618 Millard Drive Bay River, OH 44140 / US | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 15170789.0 | 21.04.2008 | [2016/04] | Priority number, date | US20070913056P | 20.04.2007 Original published format: US 913056 P | US20070968273P | 27.08.2007 Original published format: US 968273 P | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2977092 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2977092 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/46, B01D53/04 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
B01D53/0407 (EP,US);
A61M16/202 (US);
A61M16/0063 (US);
A61M16/0677 (EP,US);
A61M16/101 (EP,US);
A61M16/105 (US);
B01D53/047 (US);
B01D53/053 (EP,US);
A61M16/10 (EP,US);
A61M16/107 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/003 (US);
A61M2016/0036 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0216 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (US);
A61M2205/7536 (EP,US);
A61M2230/005 (US);
A61M2230/40 (US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/502 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (US);
B01D2259/40009 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40035 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40043 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2016/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PRODUKTGASKONZENTRATOR UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2016/04] | English: | PRODUCT GAS CONCENTRATOR AND METHOD ASSOCIATED THEREWITH | [2016/04] | French: | CONCENTRATEUR DE PRODUIT GAZEUX ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 03.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Observations by third parties | 04.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2018 | 11.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08746446.7 / EP2144687 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2008 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/28] |
Former [2020/52] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4575042 (GRIMLAND CHARLES J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 61 *; | [A]US4648888 (ROWLAND ROBERT O [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 3, line 39 * * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 2 ** column 6, lines 4-31 *; | [XI]US2006086251 (SPRINKLE THOMAS B [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] - [0062] - [0066] , [0067] , [0084] - [0086] - [0102] , [0116] - [0118] * [I] 5,6,8-15; | [A]WO2006092635 (CONCEPT 2 MANUFACTURE DESIGN O [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 28 * * page 11, line 3 - page 15, line 24 *; | [A]US2006219245 (HOLDER GARY N [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0015] , [0023] - [0025] - [0027] , [0028] , [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0042] , [0043] , [0058] - [0062] * | by applicant | US4449990 | US5906672 | US5917135 | US5988165 |