EP2955465 - SNOW CANNON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pickl, Stefan Tauerntalstrasse 5 9971 Matrei in Osttirol / AT | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Postfach 85 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Postfach 85 6010 Innsbruck / AT | ||
Former [2015/51] | Gangl, Markus, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 15171116.5 | 09.06.2015 | [2015/51] | Priority number, date | AT20140000465 | 12.06.2014 Original published format: AT 4652014 | [2015/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955465 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2955465 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25C3/04 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
F25C3/04 (EP,AT);
F25C2303/044 (AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNEEKANONE | [2015/51] | English: | SNOW CANNON | [2015/51] | French: | CANON A NEIGE | [2015/51] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2015 | AL | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | HR | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | MK | 15.11.2017 | MT | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | RS | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | SM | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | IE | 09.06.2018 | LU | 09.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 09.06.2015 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MK | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 09.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 09.06.2015 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 09.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 09.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 09.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 09.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 09.06.2018 | ||
LU | 09.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
LU | 09.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
SM | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
HR | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RS | 15.11.2017 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2002228318 (YUKI MASAHIRO) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * figure 3 * [I] 3-5,7,8,11-13; | [XI]JP2008144986 (ICEMAN CORP, et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-11 * figures 4-6 * [I] 4,5,7,8,12,13; | [A]EP0585938 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]AT509864 (PENTA PROCESS GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1679358 | EP0585938 | CA2370205 | EP2071258 |