17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
09.02.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
03.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
28.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.02.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.02.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.12.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.12.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
09.12.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
09.12.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
11.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.07.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.05.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.05.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.05.2016 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
08.03.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.12.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
10.12.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.11.2015 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
12.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|