EP2958098 - DISPLAY DEVICE FOR DIGITAL IMAGE CONTENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Killisch Von Horn, Philipp Arsenal Objekt 7/8/1/4 1030 Wien / AT | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Weiser, Andreas Patentanwalt Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 15172058.8 | 15.06.2015 | [2015/52] | Priority number, date | AT20140050094U | 20.06.2014 Original published format: AT 5009414 U | [2015/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2958098 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/30, G09F9/33, G09F15/00, G09F7/18 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
G09F15/0062 (EP);
G09F9/33 (EP,AT);
G09F15/00 (AT);
G09F15/0025 (EP);
G09F15/0056 (EP);
G09F19/00 (AT);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2015/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIGITALE BILDINHALTE | [2015/52] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE FOR DIGITAL IMAGE CONTENTS | [2015/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR CONTENUS D'IMAGE NUMERIQUES | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP16168877.5 / EP3073475 | EP16168881.7 / EP3073476 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009298385 (BRINCKERHOFF SANDRA [US]) [X] 1,2,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0031] , [0035] , [0049]; figures 1,3,4,7 * [Y] 4-7,11,12 [I] 3,9,10,15; | [Y]US6240666 (APEL RAIMUND [DE], et al) [Y] 5 * column 4 - column 4; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO8304124 (VICINO ROBERT K) [Y] 4,6,7,11,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008099295 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 15 * abstract * | by applicant | CN203232654U | US2009107020 |