EP2993473 - METHODS FOR DETERMINING CANCER RESISTANCE TO HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacyclics LLC 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2016/21] |
Former [2016/10] | For all designated states Pharmacyclics, Inc. 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUGGY, Joseph J. 858 Cuesta Drive Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Sriram 1623 Howard Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15172858.1 | 30.01.2008 | [2016/10] | Priority number, date | US20070887318P | 30.01.2007 Original published format: US 887318 P | US20070911855P | 13.04.2007 Original published format: US 911855 P | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993473 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N5/0693 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/57419 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/57492 (EP,KR,US);
C07H21/04 (US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2537/143 (KR);
C12Q2545/114 (KR);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/112 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/158 (US);
C12Q2600/16 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KREBSRESISTENZ GEGEN HISTONDEACETYLASEHEMMER | [2016/10] | English: | METHODS FOR DETERMINING CANCER RESISTANCE TO HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS | [2016/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA RÉSISTANCE DU CANCER AUX INHIBITEURS DE L'HISTONE DÉSACÉTYLASE | [2016/10] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08728620.9 / EP2107911 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1400806 (G2M CANCER DRUGS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005043161 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]WO2005059108 (BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005086891 (ROSETTA INPHARMATICS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP1595952 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006015312 (ROSETTA INPHARMATICS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X] - NAM MYEONG J ET AL, "Identification of defensin alpha 6 as a potential biomarker in colon adenocarcinoma", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, vol. 280, no. 9, doi:10.1074/JBC.M410054200, ISSN 0021-9258, (20050304), pages 8260 - 8265, (20041221), XP002554542 [X] 1-4,6-11 * abstract * * material and methods: paragraph on microarrays. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M410054200 | [A] - SASAKAWA Y ET AL, "Marker genes to predict sensitivity to FK228, a histone deacetylase inhibitor", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 69, no. 4, ISSN 0006-2952, (20050215), pages 603 - 616, (20050215), XP027715623 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - PIEKARZ RICHARD L ET AL, "T-cell lymphoma as a model for the use of histone deacetylase inhibitors in cancer therapy: impact of depsipeptide on molecular markers, therapeutic targets, and mechanisms of resistance", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 103, no. 12, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2003-09-3068, ISSN 0006-4971, (20040615), pages 4636 - 4643, (20040302), XP002595593 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/BLOOD-2003-09-3068 | by applicant | EP0373203 | US5045694 | US5143854 | US5202561 | US5288644 | US5324633 | US5432049 | WO9521265 | US5470710 | US5492806 | US5503980 | US5510270 | US5525464 | US5547839 | WO9631622 | US5580732 | WO9710365 | EP0785280 | WO9727317 | US5661028 | US5800992 | US5953727 | US6040139 | US6111251 | US6228575 | US6308170 | - STOREY, PROC. NAT. ACAD. SET. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 9440 - 9445 | - ISHWARAN ET AL., J. AMER. STAT. ASSOC., (2003), vol. 98, pages 438 - 455 | - ., International Classification of Diseases for Oncology 3rd Edition,, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CANCER REGISTRIES | - BOVA ET AL., METHODS MOL. MED, (2005), vol. 103, pages 15 - 66 | - ., Protein Purification: Principles and Practice 3rd Edition, SPRINGER VERLAG | - HARLOW ET AL., Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1988), pages 353 - 355 | - ISSAQ ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 75, pages 149A - 155A | - KERN ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER I ST., (1990), vol. 82, pages 582 - 588 | - LUZZI ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2005), vol. 293, pages 187 - 207 | - KERN ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1990), vol. 82, pages 582 - 588 | - STOREY ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, pages 9440 - 9445 | US20040858867 |