EP3109573 - COMPONENTS CROSS-MAPPING IN A REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emerson Climate Technologies GmbH Am Borsigturm 31 13507 Berlin / DE | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTAGNOLIO, Stephane c/o Emerson Climate Technologies GmbH Rue des Trois Bourdons, 27 4840 Welkenraedt / BE | 02 /
WINANDY, Eric c/o Emerson Climate Technologies GmbH Rue des Trois Bourdons, 27 4840 Welkenraedt / BE | 03 /
STEILS, Raymond c/o Emerson Climate Technologies GmbH Rue des Trois Bourdons, 27 4840 Welkenraedt / BE | 04 /
ZHAO, Haibin c/o Emerson Climate Technologies GmbH Rue des Trois Bourdons, 27 4840 Welkenraedt / BE | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Breite Straße 27 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15173519.8 | 24.06.2015 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109573 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3109573 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/00 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
F25B49/005 (EP,CN,US);
F25B49/02 (US);
F25B31/00 (US);
G05B13/048 (US);
F25B2400/06 (US);
F25B2500/19 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2513 (US);
F25B2700/191 (US);
F25B2700/1931 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2016/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMPONENTEN-CROSS-MAPPING IN EINEM KÜHLSYSTEM | [2016/52] | English: | COMPONENTS CROSS-MAPPING IN A REFRIGERATION SYSTEM | [2016/52] | French: | CARTOGRAPHIE CROISÉE DE COMPOSANTS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2016/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 19.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2015 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | NL | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 24.06.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 24.06.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008100255 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [X] 10 * page 6 - page 15; figures 1-7 * [A] 1-9; | [XA]EP1965158 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 10 * page 3 - page 9; figures 1,2 *[A] 1-9 | by applicant | US4878355 | EP0237822 | EP0217558 | US5506768 | US6318101 | EP0883047 | US6701725 | US6711911 | US6799951 | US2005126190 | US6981384 | US7290402 | WO2008147828 | US7509817 | WO2009048466 | US8096141 | US2013174591 | US2013205815 | US8775123 |