EP2965796 - FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Banny, Klaus Novaragasse 22/2 1020 Wien / AT | For all designated states Banny-Reiter, Ulrike Novaragasse 22/2 1020 Wien / AT | For all designated states Hartl, Robert Wenzlberg 32 2453 Sommerein / AT | For all designated states Hartl, Andrea Wenzlberg 32 2453 Sommerein / AT | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Operngasse 4 P.O. Box 96 1010 Wien / AT | [2016/02] | Application number, filing date | 15173726.9 | 25.06.2015 | [2016/02] | Priority number, date | AT20140050470 | 04.07.2014 Original published format: AT 504702014 | [2016/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2965796 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/35, B01D29/76, B01D29/94 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
B01D29/35 (EP,AT);
B01D29/76 (EP);
B01D29/94 (EP);
B01D2201/287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2016/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 13.07.2016 | ME | 13.07.2016 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTER | [2016/02] | English: | FILTER | [2016/02] | French: | FILTRE | [2016/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1138020 (FRANZ BAUMER ING) [X] 1-4 * column 2, lines 29-33; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE258509 (VULCAN WERKE AG) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 4-18; figure 3 *; | [X]DE102004001760 (GREENLIFE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2004104159 (TERRAZAS BENAVIDES JULIAN [MX], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE3116875 | JPH01165838 | CN202506180U |