EP2963674 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT À L'ÉNERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ÉNERGIES ALTERNATIVES Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/30] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT À L'ÉNERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ÉNERGIES ALTERNATIVES Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES ALTERNATIVES Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGENDRE, Emmanuel 79 allée des Martagons 38330 Montbonnot / FR | 02 /
BARON, Thierry 20 rue du Charmant Som 38120 Saint-Egrève / FR | [2023/30] |
Former [2016/01] | 01 /
AUGENDRE, Emmanuel 79 allée des Martagons 38330 MONTBONNOT / FR | ||
02 /
BARON, Thierry 20 rue du Charmant Som 38120 SAINT-EGREVE / FR | Representative(s) | Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [2023/30] |
Former [2016/01] | Hautier, Nicolas Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 15174396.0 | 29.06.2015 | [2016/01] | Priority number, date | FR20140056201 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: FR 1456201 | [2016/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963674 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2963674 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L29/78, H01L29/66 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L29/1054 (US);
H01L21/0245 (EP,US);
H01L21/02452 (EP,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/02463 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02535 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02546 (EP,US);
H01L21/02598 (US);
H01L21/02636 (US);
H01L21/02639 (EP,US);
H01L21/30604 (US);
H01L21/30612 (US);
H01L21/3081 (US);
H01L21/31 (US);
H01L21/31116 (US);
H01L21/324 (US);
H01L21/3245 (US);
H01L21/823431 (US);
H01L29/04 (US);
H01L29/165 (US);
H01L29/2003 (US);
H01L29/205 (US);
H01L29/66795 (EP,US);
H01L29/7849 (US);
H01L29/785 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | H01L21/20, // H01L29/66 | ||
Former IPC [2016/01] | H01L21/02, // H01L29/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2016/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER MIKROELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MICROELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF MICROÉLECTRONIQUE | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5417180 (NAKAMURA TOMOFUMI [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 29 * * figure 3 * [A] 15,16; | [X]US2010025683 (CHENG ZHIYUAN [US]) [X] 16 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054] ** figure 5 *; | [YA]WO2010033813 (AMBERWAVE SYSTEM CORP, et al) [Y] 1-5,7-14 * page 2, line 30 - page 6, line 17 * * page 8, line 10 - line 24 * * page 9, line 23 - line 24 * * figures 2, 3 * [A] 15,16; | [YA]US2011049568 (LOCHTEFELD ANTHONY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,13,14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] * * figure 6 * [A] 15,16; | [XA]US2013119347 (CHO YOUNG-JIN [KR], et al) [X] 16 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 1-15 | Examination | US2013037869 | US2013256759 | - VAN DAL MARK J H ET AL, "Germanium p-Channel FinFET Fabricated by Aspect Ratio Trapping", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE, USA, vol. 61, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TED.2013.2295883, ISSN 0018-9383, (20140201), pages 430 - 436, (20140120), XP011537687 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TED.2013.2295883 | by applicant | - J.-S. PARK ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS LETTER, (2007), vol. 90, page 052113 |