12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
05.04.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
01.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
24.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
28.04.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
17.04.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.11.2022 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
07.11.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
15.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.07.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
08.07.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
22.06.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
17.06.2022 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
23.03.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
03.02.2022 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.01.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.05.2019 |
First examination report |
|
04.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2019 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.04.2019 |
First examination report |
|
16.04.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
13.10.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
27.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
14.07.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
07.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
24.10.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
03.07.2015 |
Change - representative |
|