Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12041419 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2024 | B2 | US2023283974 | 07.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318317713 | 15.05.2023 | US201514799463 | 14.07.2015 | US202117151454 | 18.01.2021 | US201715623266 | 14.06.2017 | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | US201815941816 | 30.03.2018 | US202217842583 | 16.06.2022 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | US201816224649 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11689870 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | B2 | US2022312132 | 29.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799463 | 14.07.2015 | US202117151454 | 18.01.2021 | US201715623266 | 14.06.2017 | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | US201815941816 | 30.03.2018 | US202217842583 | 16.06.2022 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | US201816224649 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11395075 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2022 | B2 | US2021144488 | 13.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799463 | 14.07.2015 | US202117151454 | 18.01.2021 | US201715623266 | 14.06.2017 | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | US201815941816 | 30.03.2018 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | US201816224649 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11297447 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B2 | US2019124455 | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799463 | 14.07.2015 | US201715623266 | 14.06.2017 | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | US201815941816 | 30.03.2018 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | US201816224649 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10306379 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2018227678 | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799463 | 14.07.2015 | US201715623266 | 14.06.2017 | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | US201815941816 | 30.03.2018 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10158953 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2018 | B2 | US2017006389 | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10057694 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2018 | B2 | US2017289709 | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799463 | 14.07.2015 | US201715623266 | 14.06.2017 | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6948115B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2021 | B2 | JP2017063400 | 30.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4221258 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP23168454 | 02.07.2015 | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106331970B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2021 | B | CN106331970 | 11.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK201570436 | 23.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201570436 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3113516 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2023 | B1 | EP3113516 | 04.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3113516T | 24.07.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15175140 | 02.07.2015 | Type | Divisional application | EP4221258 |