EP2997976 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INCREASING ALPHA-L-IDURONIDASE ACTIVITY IN THE CNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armagen, Inc. 30301 Agoura Road No.110 Agoura Hills, CA 91301 / US | [2019/09] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Armagen, Inc. 26679 Agoura Road, No.100 Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | ||
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states ArmaGen Technologies, Inc. 914 Colorado Avenue Santa Monica, CA 90401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARDRIDGE, William 1180 Tellem Drive Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 / US | 02 /
BOADO, Ruben 29211 Trailway Lane Agoura Hills, CA 91301 / US | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15175407.4 | 25.07.2008 | [2016/12] | Priority number, date | US20070952547P | 27.07.2007 Original published format: US 952547 P | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997976 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/40, C07K16/46, C12N9/00 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2869 (EP,US);
C07K16/46 (EP,US);
C12N9/0002 (EP,US);
C12N9/2402 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01076 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/6801 (EP,US);
A61K47/6815 (EP,US);
A61K47/6843 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ALPHA-IDURONIDASE-AKTIVITÄT IM ZNS | [2016/12] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INCREASING ALPHA-L-IDURONIDASE ACTIVITY IN THE CNS | [2016/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR AUGMENTER L'ACTIVITÉ ALPHA-L-IDURONIDASE DANS LE SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 31.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 12.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08796594.3 / EP2182980 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5527527 (FRIDEN PHILLIP M [US]) [Y] 1-16 * The whole document, in particular the examples *; | [XY]WO2004050016 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * The whole document, in particular:;; figures 1,4,5; example 6 * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]US6858206 (KAKKIS EMIL D [US]) [Y] 1-16 * The whole document, in particular the examples *; | [IY]US2005142141 (PARDRIDGE WILLIAM M [US]) [I] 1-16 * The whole document, in particular examples 6-7 * [Y] 1-16; | [I] - SCHLACHETZKI FELIX ET AL, "Gene therapy of the brain - The trans-vascular approach", NEUROLOGY, (20040427), vol. 62, no. 8, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 1275 - 1281, XP009156992 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1212/01.WNL.0000120551.38463.D9 | [A] - SIFUENTES ET AL, "A follow-up study of MPS I patients treated with laronidase enzyme replacement therapy for 6 years", MOLECULAR GENETICS AND METABOLISM, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (20070119), vol. 90, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.YMGME.2006.08.007, ISSN 1096-7192, pages 171 - 180, XP005735911 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymgme.2006.08.007 | [XP] - RUBEN J. BOADO ET AL, "Genetic engineering of a lysosomal enzyme fusion protein for targeted delivery across the human blood-brain barrier", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20080201), vol. 99, no. 2, doi:10.1002/bit.21602, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 475 - 484, XP055020493 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21602 | [A] - RUDIKOFF S ET AL, "Single amino acid substitution altering antigen-binding specificity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19820301), vol. 79, doi:10.1073/PNAS.79.6.1979, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1979 - 1983, XP007901436 [A] 11,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.79.6.1979 | [T] - RUBEN J. BOADO ET AL, "Reversal of Lysosomal Storage in Brain of Adult MPS-I Mice with Intravenous Trojan Horse-Iduronidase Fusion Protein", MOLECULAR PHARMACEUTICS, (20110801), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1021/mp200136x, ISSN 1543-8384, pages 1342 - 1350, XP055020504 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mp200136x | [T] - RUBEN J. BOADO ET AL, "AGT-181: Expression in CHO cells and pharmacokinetics, safety, and plasma iduronidase enzyme activity in Rhesus monkeys", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20091001), vol. 144, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.jbiotec.2009.08.019, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 135 - 141, XP055020498 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2009.08.019 | [A] - PARDRIDGE W M, "Blood-Brain Barrier Drug Targeting: The Future of Brain Drug Development", MOLECULAR INTERVENTIONS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, BETHESDA,MD, US, (20030301), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1124/MI.3.2.90, ISSN 1534-0384, pages 90 - 105, XP002993086 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mi.3.2.90 | [A] - MCGRATH J P ET AL, "Bifunctional fusion between nerve growth factor and a transferrin receptor antibody", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, WILEY-LISS, US, (19970101), vol. 47, ISSN 0360-4012, pages 123 - 133, XP002698610 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4547(19970115)47:2<123::AID-JNR1>3.0.CO;2-H | [T] - BOADO RUBEN J ET AL, "Genetic engineering of IgG-glucuronidase fusion proteins", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH, DE, (20100401), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.3109/10611860903353362, ISSN 1061-186X, pages 205 - 211, XP009171492 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10611860903353362 | [A] - HAISMA HJ ET AL, "Construction and characterization of a fusion protein of single-chain anti-CD20 antibody and human beta-glucuronidase for antibody-directed enzyme prodrug therapy", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (19980701), ISSN 0006-4971, XP002076505 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - MAHLER H C ET AL, "Induction and analysis of aggregates in a liquid IgG1-antibody formulation", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 59, no. 3, ISSN 0939-6411, (20050401), pages 407 - 417, (20050401), XP027805032 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5527288 | US5656284 | US5848991 | US5997501 | US6041775 | US6060069 | US6284262 | US6322808 | US6348210 | US6361760 | US6375975 | US2004101904 | US2005142141 | - BATZER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081 | - OHTSUKA ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608 | - ROSSOLINI ET AL., MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98 | - YIP, J BIOI. CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, no. 30, pages 27329 - 27332 | - WHITTAKER ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, no. 22, pages 20932 - 20936 | - KABAT ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, 5th ed., PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICE, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, BETHESDA, MD., (1991), pages 647 - 669 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2005), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1126 - 1129 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - OSBOURN ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 16, page 778 | - PLUCKTHUN, PLUCKTHUN, ROSENBURG AND MOORE, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - BOADO ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2007), vol. 96, no. 2, pages 381 - 391 | - FUKUDA ET AL., "In vitro evolution of single-chain antibodies using mRNA display", NUC. ACID RES., (2006), vol. 34, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1093/NAR/GKL618, XP002639193 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKL618 | - CHEN ET AL., "In vitro scanning saturation mutagenesis of all the specificity determining residues in an antibody binding site", PROT ENG, (1999), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 349 - 356, XP003001853 | - COLOMA ET AL., PHARM RES, (2000), vol. 17, pages 266 - 274 | - REMPEL ET AL., "A homology model for human a-L-Iduronidase: Insights into human disease", MOL. GENETICS AND MET., (2005), vol. 85, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymgme.2004.12.006, pages 28 - 37, XP027447084 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymgme.2004.12.006 | - HENIKOFF ET AL., "Predicting the Effects of Amino Acid Substitutions on Protein Function", ANNU. REV. GENOMICS HUM. GENET., (2006), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.genom.7.080505.115630, pages 61 - 80, XP055415263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.genom.7.080505.115630 | - KAKKIS ET AL., PROT EXPR PURIF, (1994), vol. 5, pages 225 - 232 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., BULL. MATH. BIO., (1986), vol. 48, page 603 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 10915 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - PEARSON, METH. ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 183, page 63 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 444 | - SELLERS, SIAM J. APPL. MATH., (1974), vol. 26, page 787 | - HENIKOFFAND HENIKOFF, PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 10915 | - BOADO ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2007), vol. 96, pages 381 - 391 | - HE ET AL., MOL GENET METAB, (1999), vol. 67, pages 106 - 112 | - KAKKIS, PROT EXPR PURIF, (1994), vol. 5, pages 225 - 232 | - ZHANG ET AL., HUM GENE THER, (2004), vol. 15, pages 339 - 350 | - TRIGUERO ET AL., J NEUROCHEM, (1990), vol. 54, pages 1882 - 1888 | - PARDRIDGE ET AL., PHARM RES, (1995), vol. 12, pages 807 - 816 | - COLOMA ET AL., PHARMA RES, (2000), vol. 17, pages 266 - 274 | - CROW ET AL., J CLIN PATHOL, (1983), vol. 36, pages 415 - 430 | US20050061956 | US20050245710 |