EP2975745 - DIRECT CURRENT MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sieva D.O.O. - Poslovna Enota Idrija Vojkova ulica 10 5280 Idrija / SI | [2018/49] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Sieva d.o.o. - Poslovna Enota Idrija Vojkova 10 5280 Idrija / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Ludvik Blekova vas 23d 1371 Logatec / SI | 02 /
LIKAR, Andrej Cesta na Pluzne 19 5282 Cerkno / SI | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15175457.9 | 06.07.2015 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | DE20141010251 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: DE102014010251 | [2016/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2975745 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2975745 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2975745 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K13/00, H02K13/04, H02K23/62 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
H02K23/62 (EP);
H02K13/006 (EP);
H02K13/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | H02K23/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROMMOTOR | [2016/03] | English: | DIRECT CURRENT MOTOR | [2016/03] | French: | MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 16.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | HR | 05.12.2018 | IT | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | MK | 05.12.2018 | MT | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | RS | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | SM | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | NO | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | IE | 06.07.2019 | LU | 06.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
IT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 05.12.2018 | |
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 05.12.2018 | |
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 05.12.2018 | |
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | |
NO | 05.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPS60162463 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,7-9 * abstract * * figures 2, 3 * [A] 2-6,10-13 [I] 14-17; | [A]WO0137405 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * figures 2-5 *; | [XAI]WO2005036717 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,13 * abstract * * figures 1, 5 * [A] 3-5,10-12 [I] 14-17; | [A]EP1796250 (ASMO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0029] ** figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | US6396175 | WO2007122767 | DE112006003837T | US7728479 |