08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
16.10.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
08.11.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.11.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
29.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
04.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
08.07.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
28.06.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.01.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
28.08.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
07.07.2015 |
Change - representative |
|