Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2962658T | 15.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1456503 | 04.07.2014 | EP15175486 | 06.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2962658 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2019 | B1 | EP2962658 | 06.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1456503 | 04.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3023198 | 29.07.2016 | B1 | FR3023198 | 08.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1456503 | 04.07.2014 |