Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016050053 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014174525 | 28.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105383999B | Global Dossier | 07.06.2019 | B | CN105383999 | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014174525 | 28.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2990367 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2017 | B1 | EP2990367 | 02.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014174525 | 28.08.2014 |