EP2980942 - SAFETY SYSTEM FOR THE ELECTRICAL CONNECTION OF ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT TO A POWER SUPPLY APPARATUS, AND ELECTRICAL INSTALLATION COMPRISING SUCH A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEGDICHE, Malik World Trade Center 38EE1 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 GRENOBLE Cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
RADU, Daniel World Trade Center 38EE1 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 GRENOBLE Cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
CISSOKO, Seyba World Trade Center 38EE1 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 GRENOBLE Cedex 09 / FR | 04 /
FERTON, Jean-Marc World Trade Center 38EE1 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 GRENOBLE Cedex 09 / FR | 05 /
RENARD, Philippe World Trade Center 38EE1 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 GRENOBLE Cedex 09 / FR | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2019/23] |
Former [2016/05] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15175945.3 | 08.07.2015 | [2016/05] | Priority number, date | FR20140057517 | 01.08.2014 Original published format: FR 1457517 | [2016/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980942 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2980942 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02H5/12, H02H7/06, H02J4/00, B60L3/00, B60L11/18, B63J3/04 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
B60L3/0069 (EP);
B60L53/16 (EP);
B60L53/31 (EP);
H02H11/001 (EP);
B60L2200/32 (EP);
B63J2003/043 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2016/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SICHERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DEN ELEKTRISCHEN ANSCHLUSS EINES ELEKTROGERÄTS AN EIN GERÄT MIT STROMANSCHLUSS, UND ELEKTRISCHE ANLAGE, DIE EIN SOLCHES SYSTEM UMFASST | [2016/05] | English: | SAFETY SYSTEM FOR THE ELECTRICAL CONNECTION OF ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT TO A POWER SUPPLY APPARATUS, AND ELECTRICAL INSTALLATION COMPRISING SUCH A SYSTEM | [2016/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MISE EN SÉCURITÉ POUR LE RACCORDEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE À UN APPAREIL D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE, ET INSTALLATION ÉLECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UN TEL SYSTÈME | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2018 | 13.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2015 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | IE | 08.07.2019 | LU | 08.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | DE | 01.02.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5202617 (NOR JIRI K [CA]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 28; figures 11-12 * * figures 3-4 *; | [A]US2014094046 (LAMB SCOTT D [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0043]; figures 11-12 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048]; figures 13-14 *; | [A]US5245219 (ROMATZICK JR DAVID H [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 43 * * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 48; figure 1 * | Examination | US5536173 | CN102130455 |