EP2985103 - METHOD OF RESTARTING WIRE ELECTRIC DISCHARGE MACHINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/07] | WIRE ELECTRIC DISCHARGE MACHINE | ||
[2019/37] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Yasuo c/o FANUC Corporation 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Ward, James Norman Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15176488.3 | 13.07.2015 | [2016/07] | Priority number, date | JP20140163926 | 11.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014163926 | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2985103 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23H1/02, B23H7/04 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
B23H7/04 (EP,US);
B23H7/16 (US);
B23H1/02 (EP,US);
B23H2500/20 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45043 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2016/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WIEDERAUFNEHMEN EINER DRAHTROSIONSBEARBEITUNG | [2019/37] | English: | METHOD OF RESTARTING WIRE ELECTRIC DISCHARGE MACHINING | [2019/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RECOMMENCER UN USINAGE PAR DÉCHARGE ÉLECTRIQUE À FIL | [2019/37] |
Former [2016/07] | DRAHTEROSIONSMASCHINE | ||
Former [2016/07] | WIRE ELECTRIC DISCHARGE MACHINE | ||
Former [2016/07] | MACHINE À DÉCHARGE ÉLECTRIQUE À FIL | Examination procedure | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 17.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.05.2019 | 22.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4338505 (KATSUBE HIDEO, et al) [AD] 1-4* abstract *; | [AD]JPH06277949 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [AD] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]US2004030440 (MURAI MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * sentence l, paragraph 2 * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0067] * | by applicant | JPS5627741 | JPH01210221 | JPH06277949 |