EP2975431 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING SIGNALS OF SEMICONDUCTOR DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsinghua University Tsinghua Park Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | For all designated states Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Floor, Block A TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Tsinghua University Tsinghua Park Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | ||
For all designated states Nuctech Company Limited 2nd Fl., Block A TongFang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Yulan 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 02 /
Li, Yuanjing 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 03 /
Fu, Jianqiang 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 04 /
Zhang, Lan 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 05 /
Du, Yingshuai 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | 06 /
Zhang, Wei 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 07 /
Ma, Xuming 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 08 /
Li, Jun 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2016/09] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
Li, Yulan 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | ||
02 /
Li, Yuangjing 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
03 /
Fu, Jianqiang 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
04 /
Zhang, Lan 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
05 /
Du, Yigshuai 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District 100084 Beijing / CN | |||
06 /
Zhang, Wei 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
07 /
Ma, Xuming 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | |||
08 /
Li, Jun 2nd Floor, Block A Tongfang Building Shuangqinglu Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 15176890.0 | 15.07.2015 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | CN201410336256 | 15.07.2014 Original published format: CN201410336256 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2975431 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2975431 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/24 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
G01T1/247 (EP,US);
G01T1/241 (US);
H04N5/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2016/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SIGNALEN EINES HALBLEITERDETEKTORS | [2016/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING SIGNALS OF SEMICONDUCTOR DETECTOR | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX DE DÉTECTEUR À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 06.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006039494 (UNIV STANFORD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,9,12 * figures 3, 4, 6, 8 * * page 22, line 9 - page 23, line 2 * * page 19, line 11 - line 23 * * page 15, line 27 - page 16, line 7 * [Y] 2,5,8,11; | [XY]US2009026371 (BOLOTNIKOV ALEKSEY E [US], et al) [X] 3,4,9,10 * figures 8, 9, 10 * * paragraph [0053] * [Y] 2,8; | [Y] - KUVVETLI I ET AL, "A 3D CZT high resolution detector for x- and gamma-ray astronomy", OPTOMECHATRONIC MICRO/NANO DEVICES AND COMPONENTS III : 8 - 10 OCTOBER 2007, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE , ISSN 0277-786X], SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASH, (20130724), vol. 9154, doi:10.1117/12.2055119, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 91540X - 91540X, XP060038579 [Y] 5,11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2055119 |