EP2983458 - METHOD FOR FIXING A SMD SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT SOURCE ON A CIRCUIT BOARD OF A HEADLIGHT OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marelli Automotive Lighting Reutlingen (Germany) GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Reutlingen GmbH Tübinger Strasse 123 72762 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gottheil, Martin Luise-Gühring Strasse 17 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Oliver Untere Gärten 28 72149 Neustetten / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2019/08] | 01 /
Gottheil, Martin Luise-Gühring Strasse 17 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | ||
02 /
Schmid, Oliver Untere Gärten 72149 Neustetten / DE | |||
Former [2016/51] | 01 /
Gottheil, Martin Jettenburgerstraße 22/1 72127 Kusterdingen / DE | ||
02 /
Schmid, Oliver Untere Gärten 72149 Neustetten / DE | |||
Former [2016/06] | 01 /
Gottheil, Martin Building 10 Room 302 Hongfenglu 358-60 201206 Shanghai / CN | ||
02 /
Schmid, Oliver Untere Gärten 72149 Neustetten / DE | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2016/06] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15176966.8 | 16.07.2015 | [2016/06] | Priority number, date | DE201410215606 | 06.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014215606 | [2016/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983458 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2983458 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/30, F21K99/00, // H05K3/34, H05K3/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H05K3/305 (EP);
H05K2201/09781 (EP);
H05K2201/09918 (EP);
H05K2201/10106 (EP);
H05K2201/10984 (EP);
H05K2203/1105 (EP);
H05K2203/166 (EP);
H05K3/0008 (EP);
H05K3/3494 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | H05K3/30, F21K99/00, // H05K3/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER SMD-HALBLEITERLICHTQUELLE AUF EINER LEITERPLATTE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFERS | [2016/06] | English: | METHOD FOR FIXING A SMD SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT SOURCE ON A CIRCUIT BOARD OF A HEADLIGHT OF A VEHICLE | [2016/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE FIXATION D'UNE SOURCE LUMINEUSE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE SMD SUR UNE CARTE DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES D'UN PHARE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2016/06] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.10.2022 | 20.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | IE | 16.07.2023 | LU | 16.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 12.09.2023 | GB | 12.10.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 16.07.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 12.09.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
IE | 16.07.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
GB | 12.10.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
LU | 16.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]DE3445625 (MERTEN KG PULSOTRONIC [DE]) [I] 1,3-13 * column 3, line 1 - line 20 * [Y] 2; | [Y]EP0307990 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 2* the whole document * | Examination | US5155904 | US2009134529 | US2013075031 | AT513747B |