EP3117841 - AUTONOMOUSLY POWERED VAPOUR RELEASE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurvest Avenue Jean Monnet 12 1400 Nivelles / BE | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luciani, Alain 28 Impasse des Rouvres 13390 Auriol / FR | 02 /
Wos, Magdalena Jaspisowa 22/12 20-583 Lublin / PL | 03 /
Bertignon, Estelle Place Roger de Looze 5/ I2 7000 Mons / BE | 04 /
Dmitruk, Aleksandra Slowackiego 41 20-461 Lublin / PL | 05 /
Slawek, Monika Hetmanska 16-79 20-553 Lublin / PL | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | August Debouzy 7, rue de Téhéran 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | August & Debouzy avocats 6-8 avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15176988.2 | 16.07.2015 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3117841 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/03 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A61L9/037 (EP,US);
A61L9/03 (US);
H05B1/0225 (US);
H05B3/0071 (US);
A61L2209/11 (US);
A61L2209/133 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOM ANGETRIEBENE DAMPFFREISETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/03] | English: | AUTONOMOUSLY POWERED VAPOUR RELEASE DEVICE | [2017/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIBÉRATION DE VAPEUR ALIMENTÉ DE FAÇON AUTONOME | [2017/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 06.06.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 17.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002030291 (JOSHI ASHOK V [US], et al) [X] 5-12,14 * paragraphs [0032] - [0056]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2003132305 (JOSHI ASHOK V [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2005155985 (MEYER BRIAN R [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0028]; figure 1; claim - *; | [I]US2007160492 (SPECTOR DONALD [US]) [I] 5-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0037]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1997518 (PESTCO INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XDI]WO2010120961 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [XD] 1,5-10,14 * page 3, lines 15-23 * * page 4, line 24 - page 10, line 12 * * page 28, line 17 - page 30, line 31; figure -; claim - * [I] 11,12; | [X]US2011017839 (BISCARDI SAMANTHA S [US]) [X] 1,2,4-14 * paragraphs [0021] - [0032]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | WO9505855 | WO2010120961 |