Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9587526 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2017 | B2 | US2016024978 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414340758 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2977569 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | B1 | EP2977569 | 27.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414340758 | 25.07.2014 |