EP2976993 - SYSTEM TO MONITOR AND ASSIST INDIVIDUAL'S SLEEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Withings 2, rue Maurice Hartmann 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2019/14] |
Former [2018/17] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2018/14] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies (France ) 2, rue Maurice Hartmann 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states Withings 2 Rue Maurice Hartmann 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUPHAN, Raphael 31 rue Jouffroy d'Abbans 75017 Paris / FR | 02 /
DUSANTER, Florent 3 rue Louis Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | 03 /
YANG, Ruiyi 14 rue des Merciers 78310 Coignières / FR | 04 /
BUARD, Nadine 24 rue des Longs Réages 92190 Meudon / FR | 05 /
HUTCHINGS, Cédric 24 avenue de la République 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | 06 /
RECHKE, Bastien 52 route du Pavé des gardes Bat C 92310 Sèvres / FR | 07 /
GAUTIER, Julien 3 rue de Viroflay 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15177440.3 | 20.07.2015 | [2016/04] | Priority number, date | US201414336856 | 21.07.2014 Original published format: US201414336856 | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2976993 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2976993 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/01, A61B5/024, A61B5/08, A61B5/11, A61B5/113, // A61B10/00, A61H9/00, A61B5/145, A61B5/16, A61F5/56, A61M21/02, G01G19/44, A61M21/00 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
A61B5/4815 (EP,US);
A61B5/0024 (EP);
A61B5/01 (EP);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/02444 (EP);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/1102 (EP);
A61B5/1126 (EP);
A61B5/113 (EP);
A61B5/4812 (EP,US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61B5/6892 (EP,US);
A61B5/7435 (US);
A61B5/746 (US);
A61F5/56 (EP);
A61H9/0007 (EP);
A61H9/0078 (EP);
A61M21/02 (EP,US);
G01G19/445 (EP);
A61B10/0012 (EP);
A61B2560/0242 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0204 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (EP);
A61B5/0022 (EP);
A61B5/02405 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (US);
A61B5/14542 (EP,US);
A61B5/165 (EP);
A61B5/4343 (EP);
A61B5/681 (EP);
A61B5/747 (EP);
A61H2201/0142 (EP);
A61H2201/0188 (EP);
A61H2201/10 (EP);
A61H2201/5048 (EP);
A61H2201/5058 (EP);
A61H2201/5061 (EP);
A61H2201/5082 (EP);
A61H2201/5097 (EP);
A61H2230/06 (EP);
A61H2230/207 (EP);
A61H2230/42 (EP);
A61H2230/50 (EP);
A61M2021/0022 (EP);
A61M2021/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0044 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0083 (EP);
A61M2205/3306 (EP);
A61M2205/332 (EP);
A61M2205/3368 (EP);
A61M2205/3375 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3561 (EP);
A61M2205/3569 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
A61M2230/06 (EP);
A61M2230/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2016/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES SCHLAFES EINER PERSON | [2016/04] | English: | SYSTEM TO MONITOR AND ASSIST INDIVIDUAL'S SLEEP | [2016/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE ET D'ASSISTANCE DE SOMMEIL D'UN INDIVIDU | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 07.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/32] | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006094969 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND, et al); | [XDI]WO2007052108 (EARLYSENSE LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2008157956 (RADIVOJEVIC ZORAN [FI], et al); | [XI]JP2008183205 (AISIN SEIKI); | [A]US2011190594 (HEIT JUERGEN [US], et al); | [XI]KR20120092249 (WOO HYO JUN [KR]); | by applicant | WO2007052108 | GB2447640 |