EP2952830 - AIR-REFRIGERANT COOLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Thermal Systems, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/46] |
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuhashi, Masato Yokohama Research & Development Ctr Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-8-1, Sachiura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-8515 / JP | 02 /
Okuda, Seiichi Yokohama Dockyard & Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 12, Nishiki-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0812 / JP | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 15177649.9 | 02.06.2005 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | JP20040224964 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004224964 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2952830 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2952830 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00, F25B43/00 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
F25B9/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/22] |
Former [2015/50] | DE, GB | Title | German: | LUFTKÜHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/50] | English: | AIR-REFRIGERANT COOLING APPARATUS | [2015/50] | French: | APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'AIR | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05746013.1 / EP1788323 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3012413 (NORMAN ANDERSON) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO9623188 (TNO [NL], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPH11132583 (KAJIMA CORP, et al) [AD] 1-4; | [A]EP1176372 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003139425 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH05106944 | JPH11132582 | JPH11132583 |