EP2983349 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/13] |
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUSHIMA, Michio c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
OHARA, Eiji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
SUGA, Daisuke c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 15177817.2 | 22.07.2015 | [2016/06] | Priority number, date | JP20140158988 | 04.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014158988 | JP20140158989 | 04.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014158989 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983349 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2983349 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04L12/26, H04L12/12 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
H04W52/0225 (CN);
H04N1/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00002 (EP,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2016/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/06] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2016/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT | [2016/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 06.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2015 | AL | 28.03.2018 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | ES | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | IT | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | NL | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IE | 22.07.2018 | LU | 22.07.2018 | MT | 22.07.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.07.2015 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
MT | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.07.2015 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
MT | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
MT | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
MT | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 22.07.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 22.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013083910 (BABA TSUYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006215229 (ITO TOMOHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003117661 (ORIKASA NORIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A]US2012229840 (FUKADA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014043637 (MORI TAKATO [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2006254384 |