EP2980210 - THERMOSTABLE XYLANASE BELONGING TO GH FAMILY 10 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 107-8556 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suda, Migiwa c/o Honda Research Institute Japan Co., Ltd. 8-1, Honcho, Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0188 / JP | 02 /
Okuma, Jiro c/o Honda Research Institute Japan Co., Ltd. 8-1, Honcho, Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0188 / JP | 03 /
Hirose, Yoshitsugu c/o Honda Research Institute Japan Co., Ltd. 8-1, Honcho, Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0188 / JP | 04 /
Yamaguchi, Asuka c/o Honda Research Institute Japan Co., Ltd. 8-1, Honcho, Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0188 / JP | 05 /
Kondo, Yasuhiro c/o Honda Research Institute Japan Co., Ltd. 8-1, Honcho, Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0188 / JP | 06 /
Kato, Tomohiko c/o Kazusa DNA Research Institute 2-6-7, Kazusa-kamatari, Kisarazu-shi Chiba, 292-0818 / JP | 07 /
Shibata, Daisuke c/o Kazusa DNA Research Institute 2-6-7, Kazusa-kamatari, Kisarazu-shi Chiba, 292-0818 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15178464.2 | 27.07.2015 | [2016/05] | Priority number, date | JP20140153337 | 28.07.2014 Original published format: JP 2014153337 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980210 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/24 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
C12N9/2482 (EP,CN,US);
C12P19/02 (CN,US);
C12P19/04 (CN,US);
C12P19/14 (CN,US);
C12Y302/01008 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOSTABILE XYLANASE AUS DER GH-FAMILIE 10 | [2016/05] | English: | THERMOSTABLE XYLANASE BELONGING TO GH FAMILY 10 | [2016/05] | French: | XYLANASE THERMOSTABLE APPARTENANT À LA FAMILLE GH 10 | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 03.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - S. Blank ET AL, "Biochemical Characterization of a Recombinant Xylanase from Thermus brockianus, Suitable for Biofuel Production", JSM Biotechnol Bioeng 2(1), (20140514), page 1027, URL: http://www.jscimedcentral.com/Biotechnology/download.php?file=biotechnology-spid-industrial-biotechnology-made-germany-1027.pdf, (20151016), XP055221511 [X] 1-10 * page 1028, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1029, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 1032, column r, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figures 2A, 3A * | [P] - "Thermus brockianus xynA gene for Endo-1,4-beta-xylanase, strain GE-1", EMBL, (20151008), Database accession no. HG931726, URL: EBI, XP002747703 [P] * sequence . * | [X] - HAO SHI ET AL, "A novel highly thermostable xylanase stimulated by Ca2+ from Thermotoga thermarum: cloning, expression and characterization", BIOTECHNOLOGY FOR BIOFUELS, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20130218), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1754-6834-6-26, ISSN 1754-6834, page 26, XP021142741 [X] 1-10 * figures 1a, 1b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1754-6834-6-26 | [A] - "RecName: Full=Beta-xylanase {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361174}; EC=3.2.1.8 {ECO:0000256|RuleBase:RU361174};", UniProt, (20120321), Database accession no. H2JS44, URL: EBI, XP002747249 [A] 1-10 * sequence . * | by applicant | US5902581 | US6083733 | JP2004121257 | US5759840 | US5866408 | US7060482 | US2010062511 | US2006014247 | US5395765 | US5688668 | - ZHENG QIANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, (2001), vol. 92, pages 423 - 428 | - WINTERHALTER; LIEBL, APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 61, pages 1810 - 1815 | - YOON ET AL., AGRICULTURAL CHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 47, pages 157 - 160 | - KISHISHITA ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2014), vol. 94, pages 40 - 45 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning - A Laboratory Manual, 3rd ed., COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS | - QUINLAN ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2008), vol. 5, pages 179 - 81 | - HOFF ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 37 | - FINN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH DATABASE, (2010), pages D211 - 222 |