EP2958012 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, SETUP METHOD, SETUP PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM ON WHICH THE SETUP PROGRAM IS RECORDED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHBITSU, Toshiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
HIGUCHI, Hisamichi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
URUSHIHARA, Masashi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Ward, James Norman, et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Bürkleinstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Ward, James Norman Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15178584.7 | 15.09.2004 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2958012 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/06, G06F12/14, G11B20/10, H04L9/14 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F7/58 (KR);
G11B20/00246 (EP,US);
G11B20/00362 (EP,US);
G11B20/00442 (EP,US);
G11B20/00514 (EP,US);
G11B20/00855 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/29] |
Former [2015/52] | DE, GB | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, EINRICHTUNGSVERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNGSPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEM EINRICHTUNGSPROGRAMM | [2015/52] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, SETUP METHOD, SETUP PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM ON WHICH THE SETUP PROGRAM IS RECORDED | [2015/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE, PROGRAMME D'INSTALLATION ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR SUR LEQUEL EST ENREGISTRÉ LE PROGRAMME D'INSTALLATION | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 22.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04773105.4 / EP1811372 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5830064 (BRADISH G JOHNSTON [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 28 - line 40; figure 4 * * column 8, line 24 - line 36 * * column 20, line 24 - line 49 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]US6144743 (YAMADA HISASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 16 - line 20; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 43 - line 55 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 4 * * column 11, line 50 - line 56; figure 9 * * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 2 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]US2003045979 (OGASAWARA AKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0029] , [0030] *[I] 2-4 |