Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102224378B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2021 | B1 | KR20160018429 | 17.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102014011845 | 08.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6633318B | Global Dossier | 22.01.2020 | B2 | JP2016037286 | 22.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102014011845 | 08.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2993365 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2019 | B1 | EP2993365 | 09.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014011845 | 08.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014011845 | 11.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014011845 | 08.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2759233T | 08.05.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102014011845 | 08.08.2014 |