EP3124401 - A LINER HAVING MULTIPLE WALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cesur Ambalaj San. ve Tic. A.S. Cumhuriyet Mahallesi Yüzyil Caddesi No:64 Kartal 34876 Istanbul / TR | For all designated states Cesur, Cihan Cumhuriyet Mahallesi Yüzyil Caddesi No:64 Kartal 34876 Istanbul / TR | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CESUR, Cihan Cesur Ambalaj San. ve Tic. A.S. Cumhuriyet Mahallesi, Yüzyil Caddesi No:64 Kartal 34876 Istanbul / TR | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 15179063.1 | 30.07.2015 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3124401 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/16 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
B65D88/1618 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSKLEIDUNG MIT MEHREREN WÄNDEN | [2017/05] | English: | A LINER HAVING MULTIPLE WALLS | [2017/05] | French: | DOUBLURE À PAROIS MULTIPLES | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6371646 (LAFLEUR LEE [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 60 - column 7, line 6; figures 1-14 *; | [XI]US2008310766 (PLUNKETT JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,13 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1,4 * [I] 3,9-12; | [X]US5918984 (LAFLEUR LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13 * column 4, line 11 - column 9, line 19; figures 1-33 *; | [A]US5759144 (DERBY NORMAN C [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 37 - column 8, line 26; figures 3-7 * | by applicant | US5556205 |