|
21.07.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
03.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
03.06.2016 |
(Partial) description filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.2016 |
(Partial) description filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Amended documents not in agreement with original documents |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
(Partial) description filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
28.10.2015 |
(Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Deficiencies in application documents - annex B |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
43 |