Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9962356 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2018 | B2 | US2017354628 | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031135 | 30.07.2014 | US201514814494 | 30.07.2015 | US201715626125 | 18.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9775822 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2016081967 | 24.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031135 | 30.07.2014 | US201514814494 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10420744 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2019 | B2 | US2018311198 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031135 | 30.07.2014 | US201514814494 | 30.07.2015 | US201715626125 | 18.06.2017 | US201815936376 | 26.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3050561 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2020 | B1 | EP3050561 | 14.09.2016 | A3 | EP3050561 | 03.08.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462031135 | 30.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3050561T | 16.11.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201462031135 | 30.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2831428T | 08.06.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201462031135 | 30.07.2014 |