EP2980987 - FREQUENCY DOWN-CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leong, Frank c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | 02 /
Drago, Salvatore c/o NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Lee, Candice Jane NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2020/39] |
Former [2016/05] | Terblanche, Candice Jane NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15179248.8 | 31.07.2015 | [2016/05] | Priority number, date | US201414449556 | 01.08.2014 Original published format: US201414449556 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980987 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2980987 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03D7/16 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
H03D7/161 (EP,US);
H03D7/165 (US);
H03D7/18 (US);
H04B1/16 (US);
H03D7/166 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] |
Former [2016/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FREQUENZABWÄRTSUMSETZUNG | [2016/05] | English: | FREQUENCY DOWN-CONVERSION | [2016/05] | French: | CONVERSION PAR ABAISSEMENT DE FRÉQUENCE | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 20.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2020 | 17.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2015 | AL | 23.09.2020 | AT | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | ES | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | IT | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MK | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | RS | 23.09.2020 | SE | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | SM | 23.09.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | GR | 24.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 31.07.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007264945 (CARREZ FREDERIC [US]) [X] 1-5,11-15 * paragraph [0040]; figure 5A *[I] 6-10; | [XI]US2008284487 (PULLELA RAJASEKHAR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13 * figure 4 * [I] 6-10; | [XI]US2012322398 (PULLELA RAJA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13 * figures 3A,B * [I] 6-10 | Examination | US2004259519 | US2007042743 | EP2408118 | - KYEONGHO LEE ET AL, "A single-chip 2.4 GHz direct-conversion CMOS receiver for wireless local loop using one-third frequency local oscillator", VLSI CIRCUITS, 2000. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. 2000 SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20000615), doi:10.1109/VLSIC.2000.852846, ISBN 978-0-7803-6309-0, pages 42 - 45, XP032400239 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VLSIC.2000.852846 |