EP2979590 - DEVICE FOR MAINTAINING SOIL MOISTURE IN PLANT VASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrini, Massimiliano Via Aido Moro 66 57037 Portoferraio / IT | For all designated states Manfanetti, Roberto Via Coen 2 57123 Livorno / IT | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Valenza, Silvia, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Valenza, Silvia, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15179302.3 | 31.07.2015 | [2016/05] | Priority number, date | IT2014FI00183 | 01.08.2014 Original published format: IT FI20140183 | IT2014FI00208 | 12.09.2014 Original published format: IT FI20140208 | [2016/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979590 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47G7/08 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
A47G7/085 (EP);
A01G13/00 (EP);
Y02A40/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG VON BODENFEUCHTIGKEIT IN PFLANZENVASEN | [2016/05] | English: | DEVICE FOR MAINTAINING SOIL MOISTURE IN PLANT VASES | [2016/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MAINTENIR L'HUMIDITÉ DU SOL DANS DES VASES POUR PLANTES | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 16.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001224254 (UTSUI KK) [X] 1-3,5,9-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0021]; figures 11,13,15,16 * [Y] 4,6-8; | [Y]US2014141183 (ARNOTT MACKENZIE RAE [CA]) [Y] 4 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2011079527 (HANKE LINDA A [US]) [Y] 6-8 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]GB2128083 (POT BAND LIMITED) [A] 4 * page 1, lines 99-103; figure 1 * |