EP2986031 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MODELING A CUSTOM FIT EARMOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2020/08] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | ||
For all designated states Bernafon AG Morgenstrasse 131 3018 Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kure, Gabriel c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
Reber, Monika Bertges Schürgraben 70 1714 Heitenried / CH | 03 /
Rasmussen, Karsten Bo c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Hans Jørgen Vind Demant A/S IP Management Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Nielsen, Hans Jørgen Vind Oticon A/S IP Management Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Application number, filing date | 15179327.0 | 31.07.2015 | [2016/07] | Priority number, date | EP20140180990 | 14.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14180990 | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986031 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
H04R25/652 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (US);
H04R25/65 (EP,US);
H04R2225/77 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2016/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR MODELLIERUNG EINER MASSGESCHNEIDERTEN OHRPLASTIK | [2016/07] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MODELING A CUSTOM FIT EARMOLD | [2016/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MODÉLISATION D'UN EMBOUT AURICULAIRE SUR MESURE | [2016/07] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 24.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | EP19218016.4 / EP3657820 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009013286 (VOOGDT ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1939776 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007189564 (MCBAGONLURI FRED [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1909537 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2190220 (SIEMENS HEARING INSTR INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2571289 |