EP2998926 - PORTRAIT GENERATING DEVICE AND PORTRAIT GENERATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yoshiko c/o Omron Corporation 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Zhang, Lizhou c/o Omron Corporation 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
Irie, Atsushi c/o Omron Corporation 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15179476.5 | 03.08.2015 | [2016/12] | Priority number, date | JP20140182553 | 08.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014182553 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2998926 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T11/00, G06T11/60 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
G06T5/00 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US);
G06V40/166 (US);
G06V40/171 (US);
G06T2207/10004 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORTRÄTERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PORTRÄTERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/12] | English: | PORTRAIT GENERATING DEVICE AND PORTRAIT GENERATING METHOD | [2016/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE PORTRAIT | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 18.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006082579 (YAO YU-SHENG [TW]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0067] * * figure 2D * * figure 4A * [Y] 4-8; | [Y]US2012177288 (CHAUSSAT BENOIT [FR], et al) [Y] 5,7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0119] *; | [Y]US2012299945 (AARABI PARHAM [CA]) [Y] 8* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0018] *; | [Y]US2014153832 (KWATRA VIVEK [US], et al) [Y] 4-7 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0044] * | by applicant | JP2004110728 | JP2004288082 | JP2005266981 | JP2006051607 | JP2008282089 | JP2009230751 | JP2011233073 | JP2012098808 | JP2012095730 | JP2012190287 | JP2012256130 |