EP3127658 - SIDE GRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steingruber, Adrian Pflegamtstr. 7 86830 Schwabmünchen / DE | 02 /
Ohlendorf, Oliver Edith-Stein-Straße 9 A 86899 Landsberg / DE | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15179926.9 | 06.08.2015 | [2017/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127658 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, B25F5/02, B25G1/01 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
B25F5/026 (EP,US);
B25F5/006 (EP,US);
B25G1/01 (EP,US);
B25D17/043 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEITENHANDGRIFF | [2017/06] | English: | SIDE GRIP | [2017/06] | French: | POIGNEE LATERALE | [2017/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 14.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1514648 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-20 *; | [YD]EP1674216 (HILTI AG [LI]) [YD] 1 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP2159009 (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP2241408 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | EP1674216 |