EP2975051 - READILY ISOLATED BISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES WITH NATIVE IMMUNOGLOBULIN FORMAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Samuel 332 West 88th Street Apt. B2 New York, NY 10024 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Eric 310 Lexington Avenue Apt. 4E New York, NY 10016 / US | 03 /
MACDONALD, Douglas 260 West End Avenue Apt. 10C New York, NY 10023 / US | 04 /
OLSON, Kara Louise 30 Prospect Street White Plains, NY 10605 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
DAVIS, Samuel 332 West 88th Street Apt. B2 New York, NY 10024 / US | ||
02 /
SMITH, Eric 310 Lexington Avenue Apt. 4E New York, NY 10016 / US | |||
03 /
MACDONALD, Douglas 260 West End Avenue Apt. 10C New York, NY 10023 / US | |||
04 /
OLSON, Kara Louise 90 Bryant Avenue 4E-E White Plains, NY 10605 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/15] |
Former [2016/03] | Power, David J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15181155.1 | 25.06.2010 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | US20090220687P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220687 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975051 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2975051 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/06, C07K16/46, A61K39/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/24 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07K1/22 (EP,IL,US);
C07K1/00 (RU);
C07K16/06 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
C07K1/06 (RU);
C07K1/08 (RU);
C07K1/088 (RU);
C07K16/18 (RU);
C07K16/247 (IL,US);
C07K16/248 (IL,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/2866 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/46 (KR);
C07K16/461 (KR);
C07K16/468 (IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,IL,US);
C07K2317/526 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2016/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LEICHT ZU ISOLIERENDE BISPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER MIT NATIVEM IMMUNGLOBULINFORMAT | [2016/03] | English: | READILY ISOLATED BISPECIFIC ANTIBODIES WITH NATIVE IMMUNOGLOBULIN FORMAT | [2016/03] | French: | ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUES FACILEMENT ISOLÉS AVEC UN FORMAT NATIF D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.10.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10726775.9 / EP2445936 | Divisional application(s) | EP21160445.9 / EP3916011 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5945311 (LINDHOFER HORST [DE], et al); | [XA]US2002051780 (LINDHOFER HORST [DE], et al); | Examination | DE4419399 | by applicant | US7183076 |