Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10238259 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2019 | B2 | US2016066759 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014113040 | 10.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2996007 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2020 | B1 | EP2996007 | 16.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014113040 | 10.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014113040 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014113040 | 10.09.2014 |