EP2988126 - DEVICE FOR STORAGE OF UTENSILS FOR BLOOD SUGAR MEASUREMENT FOR DIABETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IME-DC GmbH International Medical Equipment - Diabetes Care Fuhrmannstr. 11 95030 Hof / DE | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamalak, Serif IME-DC GmbH International Medical Equipment - Diabetes Care Erlhofer Str. 61 95032 Hof / DE | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Sperschneider, Alexandra Die Patenterie GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Nürnberger Straße 19 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Sperschneider, Alexandra Die Patenterie GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstraße 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 15181198.1 | 17.08.2015 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | DE201410111791 | 19.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014111791 | DE201420103830U | 19.08.2014 Original published format: DE 202014103830 U | [2016/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988126 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487, A61B5/157 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/157 (EP);
A61B5/150022 (EP);
A61B5/150305 (EP);
A61B5/150358 (EP);
A61B5/150412 (EP);
A61B5/150503 (EP);
A61B5/15113 (EP);
A61B5/1519 (EP);
A61B50/00 (EP);
A61B2562/0295 (EP);
A61B5/14532 (EP);
A61M5/003 (EP);
G01N33/48778 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG VON UTENSILIEN ZUR BLUTZUCKERMESSUNG FÜR DIABETIKER | [2016/08] | English: | DEVICE FOR STORAGE OF UTENSILS FOR BLOOD SUGAR MEASUREMENT FOR DIABETICS | [2016/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RANGEMENT D'USTENSILES DESTINES A MESURER LA GLYCEMIE CHEZ LE DIABETIQUE | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 10.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/33] | 01.04.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2013338464 (STAINKEN DENNIS RYAN [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,13,14 * DRAWINGS - Reference Numerals; paragraphs [0037] - [0071]; figures 1A, 1B, 2, 4A, 4B * [Y] 9 [I] 4,6,10-12,15; | [XAYI]US2005240119 (DRAUDT GREGG R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0035]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 15 [Y] 9 [I] 6,10-12; | [XAYI]DE202012101975U (IME DC GMBH INTERNAT MEDICAL EQUIPMENT DIABETES CARE [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-14 * paragraphs [0058] - [0071]; figures 1-12 * [A] 15 [Y] 9 [I] 6,10; | [IY]EP1475038 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [I] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0044]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 9; | [YD]AT4359U (HAMMERL PETER DIPL ING DR TECH [AT]) [YD] 9 * page 5, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | AT4359U |