EP3000636 - VEHICLE HVAC SYSTEM WITH CABIN VENTILATION WHILE PARKED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstraße 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/09] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052, M/C: 483-400-402 Troy, MI 48007-5052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Mingyu 15 Old Hempstead CT. AMHERST, NY 14501 / US | 02 /
Ghosh, Debashis 2 E Pinelake Drive WILLIAMSVILLE, NY 14221-8311 / US | 03 /
Wolfe IV, Edward I. 5699 Woodruff Drive CLARENCE CENTER, NY 14032 / US | 04 /
Chowdhury, Sourav 468-D South Street LOCKPORT, NY 14094 / US | 05 /
Craig, Timothy D. 29 Hunt Club Circle 14051 East Amherts, NY / US | [2016/19] |
Former [2016/13] | 01 /
Wang, Mingyu 15 Old Hempstead CT. AMHERST, NY 14501 / US | ||
02 /
Ghosh, Debashis 2 E Pinelake Drive WILLIAMSVILLE, NY 14221-8311 / US | |||
03 /
Wolfe IV, Edward I. 5699 Woodruff Drive CLARENCE CENTER, NY 14032 / US | |||
04 /
Chowdhury, Sourav 468-D South Street LOCKPORT, NY 14094 / US | |||
05 /
Craig, Timothy D. 5558 Woods Edge CT. WILLIAMSVILLE, NY 14221 / US | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/13] | Application number, filing date | 15181424.1 | 18.08.2015 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | US201414493986 | 23.09.2014 Original published format: US201414493986 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000636 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/24, // B60H1/00 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
B60H1/00028 (EP,CN,US);
B60H1/00778 (US);
B60H1/00021 (CN);
B60H1/00821 (US);
B60H1/248 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00099 (CN);
B60H2001/00178 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2016/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG-HLK-SYSTEM MIT KABINENBELÜFTUNG BEIM PARKEN | [2016/13] | English: | VEHICLE HVAC SYSTEM WITH CABIN VENTILATION WHILE PARKED | [2016/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLIMATISATION DE VÉHICULE AVEC VENTILATION DE CABINE PENDANT LE STATIONNEMENT | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005001539 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,3-6* paragraphs [0025] , [0026]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1500534 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0017] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 1,6 * |