EP2974663 - IMAGE HANDLING AND DISPLAY IN DIGITAL MAMMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hologic, Inc. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2019/35] |
Former [2017/08] | For all designated states Hologic Inc. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | ||
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Hologic, Inc. 35 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730-1401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GKANATSIOS, Nikolaos A. 504 Larson Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | 02 /
NIKLASON, Loren 3301 Carriage Trail Hillsborough, NC 27278 / US | 03 /
SHAW, Ian 3168 Stoneleigh Court Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | 04 /
RUTH, Christopher 27 School Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Andrew P. 8 Glen Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 06 /
STEIN, Jay A. 314 Darthmouth Street Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2019/07] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
GKANATSIOS, Nikolaos A. 504 Larson Drive Danbury, CT Connecticut 06810 / US | ||
02 /
NIKLASON, Loren 3301 Carriage Trail Hillsborough, NC North Carolina 27278 / US | |||
03 /
SHAW, Ian 3168 Stoneleigh Court Yorktown Heights, NY New York 10598 / US | |||
04 /
RUTH, Christopher 27 School Street Danvers, MA Massachusetts 01923 / US | |||
05 /
SMITH, Andrew P. 8 Glen Road Lexington, MA Massachusetts 02420 / US | |||
06 /
STEIN, Jay A. 314 Darthmouth Street Boston, MA Massachusetts 02116 / US | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2016/03] | de Baat, Michiel Anton, et al Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 15181798.8 | 10.11.2006 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | US20050271050 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: US 271050 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2974663 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2974663 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61B6/025 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
A61B5/0048 (US);
A61B6/463 (EP,US);
A61B6/464 (EP,US);
A61B6/465 (EP,US);
A61B6/466 (EP,US);
A61B6/502 (EP,US);
A61B6/5235 (EP,US);
A61B6/563 (EP,US);
G06T11/003 (US);
G06T11/006 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A61B5/7232 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/10112 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (US);
G06T2207/20104 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNG UND BILDANZEIGE IN DER DIGITALEN MAMMOGRAPHIE | [2016/03] | English: | IMAGE HANDLING AND DISPLAY IN DIGITAL MAMMOGRAPHY | [2016/03] | French: | TRAITEMENT ET VISUALISATION D'IMAGES DANS LA MAMMOGRAPHIE NUMÉRIQUE | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 14.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06255790.5 / EP1792569 | Divisional application(s) | EP19182295.6 / EP3569152 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2006 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 10.11.2019 | LU | 10.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 10.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002070970 (WOOD SUSAN A [US], et al) [Y] 6* fig. 19, paragraph [0094] *; | [Y]US6490476 (TOWNSEND DAVID W [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * col. 14, line 9-30;; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2003097055 (YANOF JEFFREY HAROLD [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * (170), paragraph [0037] and [0042] *; | [Y]US2003212327 (WANG SHIH-PING [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * fig. 5; (508), paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]US2005113681 (DEFREITAS KENNETH F [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * (304), (300); paragraph [0020] * | by applicant | US6031565 |