EP2987737 - PACKAGE, IN PARTICULAR FOR WIPER BLADES OF WINDSCREEN WASHING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyna Industria e Comercio Ltda. Rua Barao do Rio Branco, 46 07042-010 Guarulhos / Sao Paulo / BR | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NACAMULI, Marc Rua Barao do Rio Branco, 46 07042-010 Guarulhos Sao Paulo / BR | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 15181805.1 | 20.08.2015 | [2016/08] | Priority number, date | BR20141020518 | 21.08.2014 Original published format: BR102014020518 | [2016/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2987737 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/48 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
B65D5/48014 (EP);
B65D2585/6885 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2016/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR WISCHERBLÄTTER VON SCHEIBENWASCHVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/08] | English: | PACKAGE, IN PARTICULAR FOR WIPER BLADES OF WINDSCREEN WASHING DEVICES | [2016/08] | French: | EMBALLAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR BALAIS D'ESSUIE-GLACE DE DISPOSITIFS LAVE-GLACE | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 27.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.04.2019 | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/32] | 30.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1737950 (SCOTLAND BAYARD S) [X] 1,7 * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]US2611529 (CURRIVAN JOHN F) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,13 * figures 4, 8 *; | [X]US2732996 (V.R. PANTALONE) [X] 1-7* figures 1, 6-8 *; | [X]GB2159498 (TAYLOWE LTD) [X] 1,6,7,11,12 * figures 1, 3,8, 9 * | by applicant | DE29901874U | DE19829125 | DE102011083955 | WO2015000781 | DE102013213207 | EP2465787 |