EP2993430 - COVER FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, AND DOMESTIC APPLIANCE HAVING A COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfister, Bernd Antoniusweg 18 89079 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Fink, Andrea Karlstraße 87 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 03 /
Staud, Ralph Wörthstr. 30 81667 München / DE | 04 /
Sachon, Robert Holzstr. 33 80469 München / DE | [2016/10] | Application number, filing date | 15182015.6 | 21.08.2015 | [2016/10] | Priority number, date | DE201410217660 | 04.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014217660 | [2016/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2993430 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2993430 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/10, F24C15/06, F24C15/08, B44C5/04, H05K7/18, A47L15/42, // A47B96/20 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
F25D23/10 (EP);
F24C15/06 (EP);
A47L15/4251 (EP);
A47L15/4265 (EP);
F25D2400/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2016/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERKLEIDUNG FÜR EIN HAUSHALTSGERÄT SOWIE HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT EINER VERKLEIDUNG | [2016/10] | English: | COVER FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE, AND DOMESTIC APPLIANCE HAVING A COVER | [2016/10] | French: | REVÊTEMENT POUR UN APPAREIL MÉNAGER ET APPAREIL MÉNAGER DOTE D'UN REVÊTEMENT | [2022/52] |
Former [2016/10] | REVETEMENT POUR UN APPAREIL MENAGER ET APPAREIL MENAGER DOTE D'UN REVETEMENT | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | GB | 21.08.2023 | IE | 21.08.2023 | LU | 21.08.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
GB | 21.08.2023 | ||
IE | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
GB | 21.08.2023 | ||
IE | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0104497 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) [X] 1,2,8,9,12-14 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 *; | [X]US4771908 (MCINTOSH RENNIE F [GB]) [X] 1-7,9,10,13-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 21 * * column 2, lines 44-59 * * column 3, lines 28-32 * * column 6, lines 54-61 *; | [XI]US4946032 (STODDARD DAVID C F [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 42 * [I] 13,15; | [XI]US6086174 (GRAVES WILLIAM B [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,13,15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 21-40 * * column 2, lines 57-61 * * column 4, lines 28-37 * [I] 11; | [X]GB2346438 (STOVES GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1-5,9,10,13 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - line 19 *; | [XI]JP2008161442 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * [I] 4-7; | [A]EP2378206 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0018] , [0 22] * | by applicant | EP2484996 |