EP2974633 - FULL AUTOMATIC TURKISH COFFEE COOKING AND SERVING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arzum Elektrikli Ev Aletleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Otakçilar Caddesi No:78 Kat:1 B Blok No:B1b 34050 Istanbul / TR | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATILLA, Ersoy Arzum Elektrikli Ev Aletleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Otakçilar Caddesi No:78, Kat:1 B Blok No:B1b Eyup Istanbul 34050 ISTANBUL / TR | [2020/08] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
ATILLA, Ersoy Arzum Elektrikli Ev Aletleri San. Ve Tic. A.S. Otakcilar Caddesi No:78, Kat:1 B Blok No:B1b Eyup Istanbul 34050 ISTANBUL / TR | Representative(s) | Kaya, Erdem Erdem Kaya Patent Inc. Konak Mahallesi Kudret Sk. Elitpark Park Sit. Ofisler Apt. No: 12/27 16110 Nilüfer/Bursa / TR | [2020/08] |
Former [2016/03] | Kaya, Erdem Erdem Kaya Patent Inc. Konak Mah. Kudret Sok. Senyurt Is Merkezi No. 6 Daire: 8 16110 Nilüfer/Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 15182395.2 | 20.03.2013 | [2016/03] | Priority number, date | TR20120003218 | 21.03.2012 Original published format: TR 201203218 | TR20120014653 | 14.12.2012 Original published format: TR 201214653 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2974633 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2974633 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/18, A47J31/36, A23F5/26, // A47J31/40 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A47J31/18 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A47J31/36 (KR,US);
A23F5/265 (EP,KR,US);
A23F5/267 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/00 (KR);
A47J31/40 (EA,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2016/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VOLLAUTOMAT ZUM KOCHEN UND SERVIEREN VON TÜRKISCHEM KAFFEE | [2016/03] | English: | FULL AUTOMATIC TURKISH COFFEE COOKING AND SERVING MACHINE | [2016/03] | French: | MACHINE ENTIÈREMENT AUTOMATIQUE PERMETTANT DE PRÉPARER ET DE SERVIR DU CAFÉ TURC | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13715626.1 / EP2827751 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2013 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | ES | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | IT | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | IE | 20.03.2020 | LU | 20.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 20.03.2013 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.03.2020 | ||
LU | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.03.2013 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.03.2020 | ||
LU | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.03.2020 | ||
LU | 20.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 20.03.2020 | ||
LU | 20.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 20.03.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2898842 (HUCK ALFRED J, et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract ** column 1, line 15 - line 38 *; | [XYI]DE10034720 (LANG CHRISTOPH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 18 * * column 1, line 55 - column 1, line 67 * * column 2, line 14 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 56 - column 2, line 62 * * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 7 * [Y] 3 [I] 5; | [YA]US6796705 (KHUBANI ASHOK [US]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0028] * [A] 1,2,4-7; | [A]WO2011039222 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | Examination | DE202009008447U | by applicant | EP2077742 | TR200905555 | TR201109954 |