Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
01.01.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.08.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.07.2018 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
25.05.2018 | Change - classification | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 | Change - classification | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
17.04.2018 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
16.02.2018 | Change - representative | |
13.12.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.12.2017 | First examination report | |
25.08.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
25.08.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
25.08.2017 | Change - designated states | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
23.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.08.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.01.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
26.08.2015 | Change - representative |