Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9797353 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2017 | B2 | US2017114760 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715400315 | 06.01.2017 | US201514829326 | 18.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017029607 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514829326 | 18.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017051709 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2017 | A1 | US9556831 | 31.01.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201514829326 | 18.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3133278 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514829326 | 18.08.2015 |