EP3133278 - THERMAL FUEL DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH INSERTION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frank Jasper Pty Ltd. Level 2 186 Scarborough Beach Road Mount Hawthorn, Western Australia 6016 / AU | [2017/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JASPER, Frank Raymond FRANK JASPER PTY LTD. Level 2, 186 Scarborough Beach Road Mount Hawthorn, Western Australia 6016 / AU | [2017/08] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15182406.7 | 25.08.2015 | [2017/08] | Priority number, date | US201514829326 | 18.08.2015 Original published format: US201514829326 | [2017/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3133278 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/116, F02M31/093, F02M35/10, F01N5/02, F02M35/16, F02M31/02, F02M31/04, F02M31/08, F02M31/14 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
F02M35/10268 (EP,US);
F01N5/02 (US);
F02M31/02 (EP,US);
F02M31/04 (EP,US);
F02M31/08 (EP,US);
F02M31/093 (EP,US);
F02M31/14 (EP,US);
F02M35/10032 (EP,US);
F02M35/10052 (EP,US);
F02M35/10072 (EP,US);
F02M35/10091 (EP,US);
F02M35/116 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/08] | F02M35/116, F02M31/093, F02M35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2017/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCHES KRAFTSTOFFZUFUHRSYSTEM MIT EINFÜHRUNGSANORDNUNG | [2017/08] | English: | THERMAL FUEL DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH INSERTION ASSEMBLY | [2017/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CARBURANT THERMIQUE AVEC ENSEMBLE D'INSERTION | [2017/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 04.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0198649 (PURE ENERGY GROUP L L C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * * figures 1-6, 10, 12 * * page 10 - page 21 * [I] 5,10-12; | [XI]US5261272 (RUSH II WILLIAM B [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-4, 12 * * column 2 - column 5 * [I] 10-12; | [AD]US8881711 (JASPER FRANK RAYMOND [US]) [AD] 10 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 2 - column 3 *; | [A]US2002050261 (MIYAHARA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 4 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US3032022 (MALCOLM ROBERT H, et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-8 * * column 3 - column 4 * | by applicant | US7510171 | US8881711 |