06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
09.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
26.11.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
17.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
27.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
18.12.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] |
16.12.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.12.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.12.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.09.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
14.08.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
30.05.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
18.02.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.11.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.10.2017 |
First examination report |
|
15.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
12.09.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.09.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
09.09.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
01.03.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
28.08.2015 |
Change - representative |
|